ROOTS AND SHOOTS

Charity number: 1064070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 September 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 September 2020 63 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 February 2019 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download