ROOTS AND SHOOTS

Charity number: 1064070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £574.31k £562.05k £854.02k £1.29m £1.03m
Total expenditure £619.16k £686.50k £733.30k £1.32m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £292.15k £311.31k £619.96k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £807.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £292.15k £358.00k £14.13k £879.65k £827.05k
Income - Other trading activities £256.14k £196.32k £126.81k £397.95k £196.11k
Income - Charitable activities £24.51k £4.74k £700.19k £6.03k £5.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £804 £216 £70 £218 £90
Income - Other £714 £2.79k £12.82k £1.87k £462
Income - Legacies £0 £1.63k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £586.40k £653.74k £700.54k £1.27m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £32.76k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.20k £4.56k £4.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £32.76k £32.76k £0 £46.41k £32.76k