THE EXETER ICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £62.75k £84.29k £70.98k £72.10k £106.32k
Total expenditure £65.63k £69.96k £68.98k £60.84k £74.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A