THE EXETER ICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia Morris Trustee 11 March 2015 None on record
CHELA LOURA FOWLER Trustee 12 March 2007 None on record
Rev Chris Keane Trustee 19 July 2017
LARKBEARE CHRISTIAN TRUST Received: On time
SUSAN KATHLEEN NODEN Chair 12 March 2001 None on record
Mary Kathleen Rowe Trustee 20 January 2016 None on record
Brian Murray Trustee 19 July 2017
DEVON UNITED MISSIONARY OFFERING Received: On time