EAST LONDON COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE

Charity number: 1064266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time Download