The Siamese Cat Welfare Trust

Charity number: 1072366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 December 2019 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 December 2019 46 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time Download