Trustees GLOBAL JUSTICE NOW TRUST
Charity number: 1064066
Charity reporting is up to date (119 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAGGIE PANKHURST | Chair | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Stokes | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Sunit Bagree | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Patrick Rolfe | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Lance | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Faith Ansell | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Taylor-Dawson | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MILLER | Trustee | 12 February 1975 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DUNCOMB HOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JOY HIROM | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.