Governing document ASIAN WOMENS ADHIKAH ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 1997. CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 MARCH 1994, 29 OCTOBER 1997 AND 24 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF WOMEN WITH THE PARTICULAR INTENT OF EMPOWERING ASIAN WOMEN WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING. (1) TO PROVIDE ADVICE INFORMATION AND SUPPORT ON A WIDE RANGE OF ISSUES INCLUDING WELFARE RIGHTS, HOUSING, FAMILY AND MATRIMONIAL MATTERS, IMMIGRATION/NATIONALITY AND COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR WOMEN SUFFERING MAJOR PERSONAL CRISES SUCH AS DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. (2) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT WORK BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND THE ORGANISATION OF EVENTS FOR ASIAN WOMEN OF ALL AGES. (3) TO PROVIDE A WIDE RANGE OF SERVICES FOR ASIAN WOMEN OF ALL AGES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED GROUP WORK IN SCHOOLS, SCHOOL PLACEMENTS AND ONE TO ONE WORK WITH ASIAN WOMEN EXPERIENCING DIFFICULTY IN COPING WITH A WIDE VARIETY OF PRESSURES. (4) TO PROVIDE AN ADVOCACY SERVICE PRESENTING THE NEEDS OF ASIAN WOMEN BOTH AS A GROUP AND INDIVIDUALLY.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.