JOHN HENRY NEWMAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND ACADEMY SPECIAL BENEFITS TRUST

Charity number: 1079762
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required