Accounts and annual returns THE MACCLESFIELD MAJESTIC THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 1072947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 14 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window