TRINITY COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £72.42m £74.92m £86.88m £124.15m £70.45m
Total expenditure £62.34m £57.14m £61.01m £125.88m £67.62m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.08m £4.64m £13.49m £4.71m £3.02m
Income - Other trading activities £610.00k £665.00k £486.00k £0 £326.00k
Income - Charitable activities £10.18m £10.57m £10.90m £11.29m £12.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £59.55m £59.04m £62.01m £107.73m £54.70m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £418.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £44.74m £38.27m £40.03m £42.89m £47.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.06m £16.24m £18.22m £53.51m £20.25m
Expenditure - Governance £350.00k £321.00k £352.00k £375.00k £393.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £4.31m £5.96m £2.54m £6.73m
Expenditure - Investment management £9.91m £10.66m £12.89m £48.09m £14.89m
Expenditure - Other £6.54m £2.63m £2.76m £29.49m £0