TRINITY COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor MICHAEL GRAE WORSTER Trustee 01 September 2016
TRINITY IN CAMBERWELL Received: On time
Richard Reginald Turnill Trustee 06 January 2021 None on record
Professor Samita Sen Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Dr Benjamin James Spagnolo Trustee 06 February 2021 None on record
Professor Sir William Timothy Gowers Trustee 09 February 2019 None on record
Dame Sally Claire Davies Chair 08 October 2019 None on record
Professor Philip Russell Hardie Trustee 09 February 2019 None on record
Professor Alan Hardwick Windle Trustee 08 February 2020 None on record
Professor Caterina Ducati Trustee 06 February 2021 None on record
Dr Arthur Charles Norman Trustee 08 February 2020 None on record
Professor Mary Teresa Josephine Webber Trustee 09 February 2019 None on record
Professor Frederick Malte Grosche Trustee 08 February 2020 None on record