DOORWAY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Doorway works with vulnerable young people aged 16-25yrs who are homeless or in housing need in Warwickshire. The charity's core services (Advice, Support and Development Services) work closely together to provide appropriate options for young people to enable them to sustain independent living. Doorway raises an awareness of local youth homelessness through programmes delivered in local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £78,500 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 31 December 1997: Standard registration
- 12 October 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1176552 DOORWAY
- DOORWAY (Working name)
- NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH DOORWAY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £368.53k | £358.06k | £402.56k | £412.04k | £477.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £337.32k | £343.11k | £400.69k | £458.12k | £494.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £120.39k | £234.86k | £37.14k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £21.60k | £106.42k | £78.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 20 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 06 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 06 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 03 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 03 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 21 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 21 September 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 1997 AND 26 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP, NEED AND DISTRESS AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES (INCLUDING SPECIFICALLY THE AREAS COVERED BY COVENTRY CITY COUNCIL; TAMWORTH BOROUGH COUNCIL; LICHFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL; HINCKLEY & BOSWORTH BOROUGH COUNCIL; BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL AND EAST STAFFORDSHIRE BOROUGH COUNCIL), IN PARTICULAR THOSE BETWEEN 16 AND 25 YEARS WHO ARE HOMELESS OR THREATENED WITH HOMELESSNESS
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window