EMMAUS GREENWICH

Charity number: 1064472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £827.70k £884.00k £902.88k £880.58k £995.76k
Total expenditure £762.20k £868.98k £829.79k £852.18k £845.72k
Income from government contracts £123.18k £78.61k £49.45k N/A £57.69k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £61.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £64.27k £35.02k £39.83k £42.30k £221.10k
Income - Other trading activities £553.24k £625.33k £0 £571.64k £473.38k
Income - Charitable activities £207.31k £221.54k £602.21k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.88k £2.11k £770 £345 £282
Income - Other £0 £0 £260.07k £266.29k £301.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £762.20k £868.98k £829.79k £852.18k £845.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.40k £8.58k £5.12k £16.19k £24.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0