EMMAUS GREENWICH

Charity number: 1064472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Rowe Trustee 07 May 2021 None on record
Daniel Hayes Trustee 02 June 2016 None on record
Dean Portelli Trustee 15 October 2021 None on record
JOHN NICHOLAS CLARK Trustee 23 May 2013
EMMAUS U.K. Received: On time
Odhran John Dodd Trustee 19 November 2020 None on record
NAZAR GEORGIS Trustee None on record
Ed Britton Trustee 20 July 2017 None on record
Abike Maddison Trustee 25 August 2021 None on record
GAENOR ELIZABETH MARY STEVENSON Chair None on record