THE JOHN RAY INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JRI is an educational charity whose mission is to promote environmental stewardship in accordance with Christian principles and the wise use of science and technology. To achieve this mission, the charity operates a strategy to further a number of defined teaching and communication objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 January 1998: Standard registration
- JRI (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Anthony Clarkson | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Anne Louise Scott | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
SHELLY DENNISON | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Margot Rosemary Hodson | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Shan Dobinson | Trustee | 21 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £19.47k | £26.71k | £18.18k | £15.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.89k | £17.49k | £13.81k | £16.60k | £19.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 19 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY INSTRUCTION IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, LIFE AND MISSION AND THEIR APPLICATION TO LIFE IN THE CONTEMPORARY WORLD; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE FIELDS OF THE ENVIRONMENT, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SOCIOLOGY, SOCIAL SCIENCES, POLITICS AND ECONOMICS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE IMPACT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ON SUCH MATTERS; AND (C) FOR THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND IN SO DOING TO ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO THE SUPPORTING ROLES OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INTO ENVIRONMENTAL DAMAGE, INTO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND INTO OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory
Vicarage Drive
Kinver
STOURBRIDGE
West Midlands
DY7 6HJ
- Phone:
- 01384872556
- Email:
- admin@jri.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window