Financial history ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION WATERLOOVILLE BRANCH

Charity number: 1064498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.70k £9.64k £18.81k £18.75k £8.99k
Total expenditure £6.33k £10.05k £15.76k £19.74k £7.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A