Accounts and annual returns ST PAULS YOUTH ENSEMBLE

Charity number: 1067834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 September 2019 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required