Trustees BF ADVENTURE
Charity number: 1071862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Philips | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Glenister | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Corbridge | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tregoning | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Maples | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Wingham | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE OSBORNE | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH GILLIAN OSBORNE | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILARY JANE BEECHEY | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.