THE FORD MADOX FORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 1084040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROB HAWKES Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record
Lucinda Carys Borkett-Jones Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record
Dr SARA HASLAM Trustee None on record
Dominique Marie Lemarchal Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Fiona Rose Houston Trustee 29 June 2019 None on record
PROF MAX SAUNDERS Trustee None on record
Dr SEAMUS O'MALLEY Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Dr PAUL SKINNER Trustee None on record