Accounts and annual returns DERBYSHIRE ADVOCACY SERVICE

Charity number: 1064793
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 482 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 482 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 848 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 848 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1213 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1213 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1578 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1578 days