CARELINE

Charity number: 1068801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download