CARELINE

Charity number: 1068801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £52.49k £28.60k £34.23k £56.48k £61.38k
Total expenditure £48.41k £44.38k £42.18k £38.68k £49.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £13.53k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £39.31k £6.55k £13.53k £12.51k £53.96k