CAIA PARK PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1072393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.52m £1.49m £1.56m £1.61m £1.44m
Total expenditure £1.38m £1.53m £1.42m £1.38m £1.37m
Income from government contracts £780.09k £671.61k £602.83k £417.88k £666.44k
Income from government grants £21.12k £76.71k £57.81k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.73k £3.19k £12.13k £10.10k £23.81k
Income - Other trading activities £310.33k £452.68k £248.61k £400.86k £427.94k
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.04m £1.30m £1.20m £983.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54 £69 £27 £74 £243
Income - Other £44.85k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.29m £1.22m £1.18m £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £238.90k £247.67k £202.05k £199.24k £239.37k
Expenditure - Governance £18.58k £97.04k £25.28k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0