NORTHAMPTON DOOR TO DOOR SERVICE

Charity number: 1064956
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/10/2019
Total gross income £290.37k £266.11k £218.81k £215.42k £128.92k
Total expenditure £283.10k £265.01k £215.97k £214.58k £132.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £70.86k £67.11k
Income from government grants £96.67k £88.79k £84.26k £70.86k £53.63k