PSA PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At the AGM in June 2009 PSA members agreed that the charity should be dissolved and its assets disposed of so as to support those affected by prostate cancer. The dissolution of the charity was completed on 4th June 2010.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 January 1998: Standard registration
- 09 August 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- PSA (Working name)
- PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- PSA PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.59k | £14.91k | £37.70k | £38.36k | £35.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.56k | £9.29k | £39.42k | £51.62k | £47.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 18 December 2009 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 13 January 2010 | 74 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 18 December 2009 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 13 January 2010 | 439 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 17 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 17 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 12 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 12 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 21ST SEPTEMBER 2002, 21 JUNE 2003 AND 23RD APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OR POVERTY OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER. (2) TO PROVIDE, SUPPLEMENT AND SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ABOUT PROSTATE CANCER TO PERSONS AFFECTED EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY PROSTATE CANCER AND THE EDUCATION OF POLITICIANS, THE MEDICAL AND NURSING PROFESSIONS, HEALTH AUTHORITIES AND THE MEDIA ABOUT THE NEEDS OF SUFFERERS INCLUDING DETECTION, DIAGNOSIS, COUNSELLING, REMEDIAL TREATMENT, PALLIATIVE TREATMENT, CARE, FUNDING AND EDUCATION. (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF THOSE AFFECTED BY PROSTATE CANCER BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF TREATMENT AND CARE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window