THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. THOMAS THE APOSTLE, MAMHEAD, DEVON

Charity number: 1100287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required