Trustees MARGARET PYKE TRUST
Charity number: 1064672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophia Copeman | Chair | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Kamin | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JUDITH STEPHENSON | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSANNAH HARDING MAYHEW | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
FRANCOIS PATRICK MARIE DESMOND SALAUN | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ruth McNeil | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.