COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE FOR ST ALBAN'S DISTRICT

Charity number: 1064774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £369.58k £417.41k £192.56k £9 £0
Total expenditure £277.16k £452.13k £200.95k £126.80k £0
Income from government contracts £69.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £60.00k £342.06k £98.15k N/A N/A