Friends of Ewell Grove

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCHOOL PARENT SUPPORT GROUP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 October 1997: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF EWELL GROVE INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF EWELL GROVE INFANT SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Elizabeth Dickson | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Tracy Ann Danaswamy | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Emma Powell | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paula Rising | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Matthew Hilton | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Christie | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Ann Whittle | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liza Monaghan | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lerryn Elizabeth Reynoldson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kellea Jayne York | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Slater | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Farah Sadrudin Habib Shah | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.95k | £12.05k | £27.97k | £32.54k | £35.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.74k | £5.89k | £4.98k | £39.20k | £27.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 JUL 1997 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED ON 14 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ewell Grove Primary & Nursery Schoo
West Street
Ewell
EPSOM
KT17 1UZ
- Phone:
- 02083934393
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window