Financial history HOT LINE MEALS SERVICE (LONDON)

Charity number: 1066575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £294.43k £277.37k £302.84k £356.86k £609.49k
Total expenditure £283.17k £290.88k £288.15k £290.91k £643.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £135.24k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £609.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £636.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.32k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0