Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY - ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS BRANCH

Charity number: 1065173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 August 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required