Accounts and annual returns WEST NILE WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098981
Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 May 2023 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 May 2023 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 May 2023 820 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 May 2023 1186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required