Financial history LHA LONDON LTD

Charity number: 1069428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £14.22m £14.11m £14.55m £11.50m £9.05m
Total expenditure £6.88m £7.04m £7.50m £7.28m £7.31m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.09m £832.01k £571.16k £249.73k £62.77k
Income - Charitable activities £13.00m £13.20m £13.80m £11.03m £8.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £129.87k £70.22k £178.86k £221.63k £299.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.66m £6.90m £7.40m £7.17m £7.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £220.06k £141.96k £98.76k £108.38k £119.37k
Expenditure - Governance £21.60k £25.09k £25.13k £27.64k £37.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £152.88k £196.14k £212.07k £336.95k £383.83k
Expenditure - Investment management £14.69k £2.66k £3.07k £53.69k £106.63k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0