Accounts and annual returns 10TH BURY ST EDMUNDS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1065054
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required