Accounts and annual returns INSPIRING FUTURES PARTNERSHIP TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1065063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window