Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN HOWARD & DENISE FRANCES MERRY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required