Accounts and annual returns ST IVES SURF LIVESAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1068397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 June 2021 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 June 2021 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 February 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 10 February 2021 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 March 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 17 March 2019 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 03 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 03 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window