THE GNOSALL AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY CAR SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide transport for all (elderly, infirm etc) who have no access to public transport or have difficulty with public transport for example wheelchair users. Usage includes hospital, doctors, shopping, visiting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 March 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Edward John Allen | Chair | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Smith | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Payne | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Patricia Anne Innamorati | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Morris | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Hodkinson | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR ANTONY INNAMORATI | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.00k | £1.20k | £400 | £627 | |
|
Total expenditure | £464 | £221 | £571 | £403 | £974 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 1998 AND 9TH MAY 2000 as amended on 07 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF BEING HOUSEBOUND, AGED, DISABLED OR WHO OTHERWISE FACE DIFFICULTIES IN USING PUBLIC TRANSPORT BY PROVIDING A VOLUNTARY CAR SERVICE FOR THE TRANSPORT OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Gnosall Lane
Moreton
Newport
TF10 9BX
- Phone:
- 01952691222
- Email:
- tony4inn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window