Financial history HOPGROVE PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1070921
Charity reporting is overdue by 531 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.48k £11.83k £12.06k £14.28k £20.73k
Total expenditure £19.22k £17.67k £13.47k £17.34k £8.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.43k