Accounts and annual returns GOVERNING BODY OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL (AIDED) CHIDDINGFOLD

Charity number: 1067719
Charity reporting is overdue by 1819 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 723 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 723 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1089 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1089 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1454 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1454 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1819 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1819 days