Financial history GOVERNING BODY OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL (AIDED) CHIDDINGFOLD

Charity number: 1067719
Charity reporting is overdue by 1821 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014
Total gross income £13.64k £9.28k £12.30k £11.01k £7.39k
Total expenditure £16.69k £5.28k £12.36k £13.38k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A