Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF ARBITRATORS

Charity number: 1069939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2021 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2021 361 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 27 June 2019 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 27 June 2019 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window