Financial history THE CHARITY OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF ARBITRATORS

Charity number: 1069939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £44.14k £45.68k £42.50k £43.83k £41.97k
Total expenditure £27.20k £42.36k £31.57k £30.62k £47.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A