LONDON UPTON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1065636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.20k £11.20k £5.16k £10.26k £4.99k
Total expenditure £26.49k £10.67k £5.30k £4.18k £3.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A