BURLESCOMBE AND WESTLEIGH COMMUNITY HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of Community Hall for the Civil Parish of Burlescombe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £17,431 from 5 government grant(s)
People
4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 27 November 1997: Standard registration
- BURLESCOMBE AND WESTLEIGH COMMINITY HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL BARBARY-SPRAGUE | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Grey | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Sprague | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SPRAGUE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.03k | £11.06k | £11.56k | £10.89k | £23.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.65k | £9.42k | £8.45k | £10.89k | £12.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 79 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 79 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 June 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2021 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED 26 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BURLESCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BURLESCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pear Tree House
pear Tree Close
Westleigh
Westleigh
Devon
EX16 7HH
- Phone:
- 07736889094
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window