Accounts and annual returns JULIA'S HOUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1067125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window