FIRSDOWN LOPCOMBE CORNER AND THE WINTERSLOWS LINK SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide transport for those unable to attend hospital, dentist etc or shopping
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anya Rogers | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GORDON VERITY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL BROADBENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MENZIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION MENZIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £4.70k | £2.38k | £3.67k | £3.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.29k | £3.27k | £1.57k | £2.68k | £3.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POOR SICK ELDERLY OR DISABLED PERSONS, IN THE PARISHES OF WINTERSLOW AND FIRSDOWN AND ENVIRONS, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WINTERSLOW AND FIRSDOWN AND ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYNCHETT COTTAGE
WITT ROAD
WINTERSLOW
SALISBURY
SP5 1PL
- Phone:
- 01980863472
- Email:
- gordon@theveritys.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window