Accounts and annual returns BIRKENHEAD, CLAUGHTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066304
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required