Accounts and annual returns MILLENNIUM FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1070145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 March 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 March 2019 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window